THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:29:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Dublin Trinity College, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Road East
LHSC Victoria Hosptial
Department of Critical Care
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 25 Apr 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 25 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

HOSPITAL: Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Tillsonburg

HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Dublin Trinity College, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Road East
LHSC Victoria Hosptial
Department of Critical Care
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 25 Apr 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 25 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

HOSPITAL: Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Tillsonburg

HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID ANDREW PETER BOERSMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOERSMA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID ANDREW PETER BOERSMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOERSMA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Dublin Trinity College, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 May 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 May 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jan 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Jan 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019