THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 04:14:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ateneo School of Medicine and Public Health, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Philippines

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ateneo School of Medicine and Public Health, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Philippines

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ateneo School of Medicine and Public Health, 2012
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology
01 Jul 2020 to 31 Dec 2020
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology
17 Aug 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Radiation Oncology
01 Jul 2019 to 16 Aug 2019
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 31 Dec 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology
DATE: 17 Aug 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Radiation Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 16 Aug 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019