THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:15:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad Católica de Córdoba Facultad de Medicina, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1053 Carling Ave
Civic campus
C2-Neuro Clinic
room C2174a
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-798-5555
Extension: 19164
Fax: 613-761-4752

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 12 Jan 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 12 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Universidad Católica de Córdoba Facultad de Medicina, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1053 Carling Ave
Civic campus
C2-Neuro Clinic
room C2174a
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-798-5555
Extension: 19164
Fax: 613-761-4752

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 12 Jan 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 12 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
12 Jan 2022
11 Jan 2029
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 12 2022
EXPIRY DATE: Jan 11 2029
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. MIGUEL ALEJANDRO AREVALO ASTRADA may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Neurology, University of Ottawa, in which Dr. AREVALO ASTRADA holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. AREVALO ASTRADA no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. AREVALO ASTRADA’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. AREVALO ASTRADA’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 12 January, 2022, and expires on 11 January, 2029. Upon renewal of Dr. AREVALO ASTRADA's academic appointment at the University of Ottawa, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. MIGUEL ALEJANDRO AREVALO ASTRADA may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Neurology, University of Ottawa, in which Dr. AREVALO ASTRADA holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. AREVALO ASTRADA no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. AREVALO ASTRADA’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. AREVALO ASTRADA’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 12 January, 2022, and expires on 11 January, 2029. Upon renewal of Dr. AREVALO ASTRADA's academic appointment at the University of Ottawa, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad Católica de Córdoba Facultad de Medicina, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 11 Jan 2029
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Nov 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 11 Jan 2029

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Nov 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Sep 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019