THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:39:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Hospital Dr
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Peterborough ON K9J 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-743-2121
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 849 Alexander Court
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7J2
Phone: 705-876-1066
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Aug 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 22 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Hospital Dr
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Peterborough ON K9J 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-743-2121
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 849 Alexander Court
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7J2
Phone: 705-876-1066
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Aug 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 22 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SOPHIE ALBERTA KLOPPENBURG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLOPPENBURG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SOPHIE ALBERTA KLOPPENBURG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLOPPENBURG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Dec 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Dec 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019