THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 04:13:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Cambridge School of Clinical Medicine, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 555 University Avenue
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-813-7910
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hospital Court
Lakeridge Health
Division of Critical Care
Oshawa Ontario L1G
Phone: 905-576-8711
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10 Trench Street
Mackenzie Health
Division of Critical Care
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Phone: 9058831212
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 30 Bond St
Department of Critical Care
4 Cardinal Carter
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 18 Sep 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 18 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Cambridge School of Clinical Medicine, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 555 University Avenue
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-813-7910
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hospital Court
Lakeridge Health
Division of Critical Care
Oshawa Ontario L1G
Phone: 905-576-8711
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10 Trench Street
Mackenzie Health
Division of Critical Care
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Phone: 9058831212
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 30 Bond St
Department of Critical Care
4 Cardinal Carter
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 18 Sep 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 18 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JACOB ROWAN FORBES MICHIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MICHIE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JACOB ROWAN FORBES MICHIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MICHIE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Cambridge School of Clinical Medicine, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Dec 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Dec 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Dec 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Nov 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Nov 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019