THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:18:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Zagreb, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CROATIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Neonatology
555 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-1500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Effective: 25 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 12 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - District of Columbia
USA - Maryland

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CROATIAN
Medical School: University of Zagreb, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Neonatology
555 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-1500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Effective: 25 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 12 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - District of Columbia
USA - Maryland

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARKO CULJAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CULJAT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARKO CULJAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CULJAT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Zagreb, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Oct 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 08 Aug 2029

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019