THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:45:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad de La Frontera, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 555 University Ave
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Anesthesia and Pain Medicine
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-813-7654
Extension: 202929
Fax: 416-813-7543

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Universidad de La Frontera, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 555 University Ave
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Anesthesia and Pain Medicine
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-813-7654
Extension: 202929
Fax: 416-813-7543

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MILCA ANDREA SCHMIDT VILLAGRÁN may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. SCHMIDT VILLAGRÁN is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. SCHMIDT VILLAGRÁN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SCHMIDT VILLAGRÁN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. SCHMIDT VILLAGRÁN shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. SCHMIDT VILLAGRÁN ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. SCHMIDT VILLAGRÁN ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MILCA ANDREA SCHMIDT VILLAGRÁN may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. SCHMIDT VILLAGRÁN is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. SCHMIDT VILLAGRÁN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SCHMIDT VILLAGRÁN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. SCHMIDT VILLAGRÁN shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. SCHMIDT VILLAGRÁN ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. SCHMIDT VILLAGRÁN ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad de La Frontera, 2013
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
01 Aug 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2024 to 31 Jul 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
23 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2023 to 22 Sep 2023
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
11 Aug 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2019 to 10 Aug 2019
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Aug 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 31 Jul 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 23 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 22 Sep 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 11 Aug 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 10 Aug 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019