THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:11:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of Semmelweis, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HUNGARIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Laboratory Medicine Program
11th Floor Department of Pathology
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto Ontario M5S 1A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-5203
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Movement Disorders Clinic
McLaughlin Pavilion - 7th Floor,
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst St
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Phone: 416 603 6422
Fax: 416 603 5004

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 01 May 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Neuropathology
Effective: 01 May 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 01 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Neuropathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 01 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HUNGARIAN
Medical School: Medical University of Semmelweis, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Laboratory Medicine Program
11th Floor Department of Pathology
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto Ontario M5S 1A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-5203
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Movement Disorders Clinic
McLaughlin Pavilion - 7th Floor,
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst St
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Phone: 416 603 6422
Fax: 416 603 5004

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 01 May 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Neuropathology
Effective: 01 May 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 01 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Neuropathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 01 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
16 Feb 2022
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 16 2022
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. GABOR GEZA KOVACS may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Laboratory Medicine and Pathobiology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. KOVACS holds an academic appointment at the rank of Full Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. KOVACS no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. GABOR GEZA KOVACS may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Laboratory Medicine and Pathobiology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. KOVACS holds an academic appointment at the rank of Full Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. KOVACS no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of Semmelweis, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 16 Feb 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 16 Feb 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 2019