THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:03:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Vanderbilt University, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-6448
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 08 Dec 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Massachusetts

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Vanderbilt University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-6448
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 08 Dec 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Massachusetts

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
08 Dec 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Dec 08 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. JOHANNA NATHANIA RIESEL may practise medicine independently in plastic surgery.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. JOHANNA NATHANIA RIESEL may practise medicine independently in plastic surgery.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Vanderbilt University, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 09 Dec 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Dec 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 08 Dec 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Dec 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 09 Dec 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2019