THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 03:58:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2018
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
EL - Respirology
29 Aug 2022 to 25 Sep 2022
McMaster University
EL - Respirology
01 Jul 2022 to 31 Jul 2022
University of Ottawa
EL - Respiratory Medicine
23 Sep 2019 to 20 Oct 2019
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: EL - Respirology
DATE: 29 Aug 2022 to 25 Sep 2022
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: EL - Respirology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 31 Jul 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: EL - Respiratory Medicine
DATE: 23 Sep 2019 to 20 Oct 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 25 Sep 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Oct 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2019
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2019