THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 06:08:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Weifang Medical College, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue, Suite 602
Toronto Ontario M5G 1V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Weifang Medical College, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue, Suite 602
Toronto Ontario M5G 1V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. QI ZHOU may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. ZHOU is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. ZHOU shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ZHOU is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ZHOU shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. ZHOU ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. ZHOU ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. QI ZHOU may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. ZHOU is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. ZHOU shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ZHOU is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ZHOU shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. ZHOU ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. ZHOU ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Weifang Medical College, 2009
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
26 Aug 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
01 Jul 2021 to 31 Dec 2021
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
24 Oct 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
05 Aug 2019 to 23 Oct 2019
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
DATE: 26 Aug 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 31 Dec 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
DATE: 24 Oct 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
DATE: 05 Aug 2019 to 23 Oct 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2019
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Aug 2019