THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 05:00:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2120A Hwy 551
Manitoulin Island Mindemoya Clinic
Mindemoya Ontario P0P 1S0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 377-5311
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Manitoulin Health Centre Mindemoya Site Mindemoya
HOSPITAL: Manitoulin Health Centre Mindemoya Site
LOCATION: Mindemoya

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2120A Hwy 551
Manitoulin Island Mindemoya Clinic
Mindemoya Ontario P0P 1S0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 377-5311
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Manitoulin Health Centre Mindemoya Site Mindemoya
HOSPITAL: Manitoulin Health Centre Mindemoya Site
LOCATION: Mindemoya

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SINA RUSTA-SALLEHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUSTA-SALLEHY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SINA RUSTA-SALLEHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUSTA-SALLEHY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 Aug 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Mar 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Oct 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 Aug 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2019