THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:31:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Bharati Vidyapeeth Deemed University, 2015
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Bharati Vidyapeeth Deemed University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Bharati Vidyapeeth Deemed University, 2015
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Aug 2020 to 31 Aug 2020
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
24 Oct 2019 to 31 Jul 2020
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PEAP - CF - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Aug 2019 to 23 Oct 2019
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Aug 2020 to 31 Aug 2020
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 24 Oct 2019 to 31 Jul 2020
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Aug 2019 to 23 Oct 2019
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Aug 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2019
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2019