THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:33:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Damascus Faculty of Medicine, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1280 Main St W
Room 4F
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-521-2100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Damascus Faculty of Medicine, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1280 Main St W
Room 4F
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-521-2100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HANI RASHID ZAAL may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. ZAAL is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. ZAAL shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ZAAL is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ZAAL shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. ZAAL ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. ZAAL ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 31 January, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HANI RASHID ZAAL may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. ZAAL is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. ZAAL shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ZAAL is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ZAAL shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. ZAAL ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. ZAAL ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 31 January, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Damascus Faculty of Medicine, 2004
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
01 Jul 2025 to 31 Jan 2026
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
01 Feb 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 31 Jan 2025
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
01 Jan 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
01 Jul 2023 to 31 Dec 2023
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
13 Mar 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
McMaster University
PEAP - CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
01 Jan 2023 to 12 Mar 2023
McMaster University
PEAP - CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
01 Sep 2019 to 12 Sep 2019
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 31 Jan 2026
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
DATE: 01 Feb 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 31 Jan 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jan 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 31 Dec 2023
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
DATE: 13 Mar 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jan 2023 to 12 Mar 2023
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
DATE: 01 Sep 2019 to 12 Sep 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 31 Jan 2026
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Sep 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2019
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 31 Jan 2026

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Sep 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2019