THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:27:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Rd E
Victoria Hospital
Division of Urology
Room E2-650
London ON N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-685-8451
Fax: 519-685-8455

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Rd E
Victoria Hospital
Division of Urology
Room E2-650
London ON N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-685-8451
Fax: 519-685-8455

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BENJAMIN BUCKLER BEECH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEECH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BENJAMIN BUCKLER BEECH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEECH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Oct 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Sep 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Sep 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Oct 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Sep 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Sep 2019