THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:15:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 900 Rue Saint-Denis
Montréal Québec H2X 3H8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 514-890-8309
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 655 Bay Street
Suit 1007,
Toronto Ontario M5G 2K4
Phone: (416) 281-6060
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 01 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 900 Rue Saint-Denis
Montréal Québec H2X 3H8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 514-890-8309
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 655 Bay Street
Suit 1007,
Toronto Ontario M5G 2K4
Phone: (416) 281-6060
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 01 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEANNE MARIE BOUTEAUD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOUTEAUD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEANNE MARIE BOUTEAUD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOUTEAUD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Sep 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2019