THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:18:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1200 Main St W
McMaster Children's Hospital - Hamilton Health Sciences
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Emergency Medicine
Effective: 22 Sep 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 22 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1200 Main St W
McMaster Children's Hospital - Hamilton Health Sciences
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Emergency Medicine
Effective: 22 Sep 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 22 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JULIA ANASTASIA ZELLO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZELLO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JULIA ANASTASIA ZELLO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZELLO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 08 May 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 25 Sep 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Oct 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 08 May 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Apr 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2019