THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 03:13:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Family Medicine
Queen's University
220 Bagot Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 3G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 533-9300
Fax: (613) 544-9899

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Family Medicine
Queen's University
220 Bagot Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 3G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 533-9300
Fax: (613) 544-9899

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARASH KHAIRANDISH shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. KHAIRANDISH is enrolled at Queen's University;
(2) Dr. KHAIRANDISH shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. KHAIRANDISH is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. KHAIRANDISH shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. KHAIRANDISH is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. KHAIRANDISH no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARASH KHAIRANDISH shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. KHAIRANDISH is enrolled at Queen's University;
(2) Dr. KHAIRANDISH shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. KHAIRANDISH is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. KHAIRANDISH shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. KHAIRANDISH is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. KHAIRANDISH no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
03 Aug 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2021 to 02 Aug 2021
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
28 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2020 to 27 Jul 2020
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
12 Aug 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
Queen's University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 03 Aug 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 02 Aug 2021
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 28 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 27 Jul 2020
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 12 Aug 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2019
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Aug 2019