THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 03:33:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: International Medical University, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: International Medical University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: International Medical University, 2006
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Developmental Pediatrics
01 Jul 2021 to 31 Aug 2021
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Developmental Pediatrics
01 Sep 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Developmental Pediatrics
01 Jul 2020 to 31 Aug 2020
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Developmental Pediatrics
24 Nov 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
McMaster University
PEAP - CF - Developmental Pediatrics
01 Sep 2019 to 23 Nov 2019
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Developmental Pediatrics
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 31 Aug 2021
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Developmental Pediatrics
DATE: 01 Sep 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Developmental Pediatrics
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 31 Aug 2020
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Developmental Pediatrics
DATE: 24 Nov 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Developmental Pediatrics
DATE: 01 Sep 2019 to 23 Nov 2019
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Aug 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2019
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Nov 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2019