THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:33:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Orange Free State, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1 250 279 0387
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 31 Jul 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Dec 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 31 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 19 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
South Africa

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS
Medical School: University of the Orange Free State, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1 250 279 0387
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 31 Jul 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Dec 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 31 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 19 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
South Africa

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BERNIZE VAN WYK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN WYK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BERNIZE VAN WYK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN WYK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Orange Free State, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2019
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Aug 2019