THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:01:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 825 Coxwell Ave
East York ON M4C 3E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416461-8272
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 08 Nov 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Grey Bruce Health Services Meaford Site Meaford
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
Anson General Hospital Iroquois Falls
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
Brantford General Hospital Brantford
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Meaford Site
LOCATION: Meaford

HOSPITAL: Listowel Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Listowel

HOSPITAL: Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Tillsonburg

HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

HOSPITAL: Anson General Hospital
LOCATION: Iroquois Falls

HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

HOSPITAL: Brantford General Hospital
LOCATION: Brantford

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 825 Coxwell Ave
East York ON M4C 3E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416461-8272
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 08 Nov 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Grey Bruce Health Services Meaford Site Meaford
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
Anson General Hospital Iroquois Falls
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
Brantford General Hospital Brantford
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Meaford Site
LOCATION: Meaford

HOSPITAL: Listowel Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Listowel

HOSPITAL: Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Tillsonburg

HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

HOSPITAL: Anson General Hospital
LOCATION: Iroquois Falls

HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

HOSPITAL: Brantford General Hospital
LOCATION: Brantford

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZAME ENGELBRECHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ENGELBRECHT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZAME ENGELBRECHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ENGELBRECHT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 09 Sep 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Oct 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 09 Sep 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Aug 2019