THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:38:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Clayton Park Medical Clinic
278 Lacewood Drive
Unit 101C
Halifax Nova Scotia B3M 3N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 902-445-9600
Fax: 902-445-4270

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
FCFP - Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Nov 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: FCFP - Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Clayton Park Medical Clinic
278 Lacewood Drive
Unit 101C
Halifax Nova Scotia B3M 3N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 902-445-9600
Fax: 902-445-4270

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
FCFP - Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Nov 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: FCFP - Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. UMAR HAIDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAIDER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. UMAR HAIDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAIDER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2019
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 2019