THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:40:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 Bond St
St. Michael’s Hospital
Division of General Internal Medicine
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-864-5928
Fax: 416-864-5714
Address: 825 Coxwell Ave
Michael Garron Hospital
Department of Medicine
East York ON M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 461-8272
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 76 Grenville St
Women's College Hospital
Department of Medicine
Toronto ON M5S 1B2
Phone: 416-323-7302
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 Bond St
St. Michael’s Hospital
Division of General Internal Medicine
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-864-5928
Fax: 416-864-5714
Address: 825 Coxwell Ave
Michael Garron Hospital
Department of Medicine
East York ON M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 461-8272
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 76 Grenville St
Women's College Hospital
Department of Medicine
Toronto ON M5S 1B2
Phone: 416-323-7302
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRANDON TANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRANDON TANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 Feb 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Nov 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 Feb 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2019