THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:06:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 60 Cambridge St N
Saint Vincent Hospital
Ottawa ON K1R 7A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-562-6262
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 60 Cambridge St N
Saint Vincent Hospital
Ottawa ON K1R 7A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-562-6262
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRINA EDEN GOYETTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOYETTE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRINA EDEN GOYETTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOYETTE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Jan 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Aug 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2019