THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:02:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Glasgow School of Medicine, Dentistry and Nursing, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 225 East Chicago Avenue
Chicago Illinois 60611
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 3122274100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 02 Nov 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 02 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Illinois
USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Glasgow School of Medicine, Dentistry and Nursing, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 225 East Chicago Avenue
Chicago Illinois 60611
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 3122274100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 02 Nov 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 02 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Illinois
USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUSTIN BRADLEY JIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUSTIN BRADLEY JIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Glasgow School of Medicine, Dentistry and Nursing, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2019
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2019