THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:11:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Christian Medical College, Ludhiana, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2951 Walker's Line
Burlington ON L7M 4Y1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9053363437
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Christian Medical College, Ludhiana, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2951 Walker's Line
Burlington ON L7M 4Y1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9053363437
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KARISHMA DANDONA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DANDONA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KARISHMA DANDONA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DANDONA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Christian Medical College, Ludhiana, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Nov 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Mar 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Nov 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Oct 2019