THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:18:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Manipal College of Medical Sciences (MCOMS), 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 335 Queenston Road
Hamilton Ontario L8K 1H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289 389 4545
Fax: 905 561 7715

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Oct 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 25 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI
Medical School: Manipal College of Medical Sciences (MCOMS), 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 335 Queenston Road
Hamilton Ontario L8K 1H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289 389 4545
Fax: 905 561 7715

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Oct 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 25 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VISHVARAJ SINHJI RATHOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RATHOD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VISHVARAJ SINHJI RATHOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RATHOD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Manipal College of Medical Sciences (MCOMS), 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 2022
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Oct 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2019
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 May 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2019