THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 04:54:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 520 Boulevard de l'Hôpital
Centre d'Urologie de Gatineau
Urology
3D
Gatineau Québec J8V 3T4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 8193071722
Fax: 8198811651
Address: 909 Boulevard la Vérendrye Ouest
Hopital de Gatineau
Division of Urology
Gatineau Québec J8V 3R2
Phone: 8199666100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 29 May 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 520 Boulevard de l'Hôpital
Centre d'Urologie de Gatineau
Urology
3D
Gatineau Québec J8V 3T4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 8193071722
Fax: 8198811651
Address: 909 Boulevard la Vérendrye Ouest
Hopital de Gatineau
Division of Urology
Gatineau Québec J8V 3R2
Phone: 8199666100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 29 May 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMIR KSARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KSARA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMIR KSARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KSARA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Nov 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Oct 2019