THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:32:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Aberdeen School of Medicine, Medical Sciences and Nutrition, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 Bond St
St Michaels Hospital
BARLO MS Center
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 347 Rumsey Rd
Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
Brain and Spinal Cord
Toronto ON M4G 1R7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 19 Sep 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 19 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Aberdeen School of Medicine, Medical Sciences and Nutrition, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 Bond St
St Michaels Hospital
BARLO MS Center
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 347 Rumsey Rd
Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
Brain and Spinal Cord
Toronto ON M4G 1R7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 19 Sep 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 19 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
12 Dec 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Dec 12 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ROBERT JOHN SIMPSON may practise medicine independently in physical medicine and rehabilitation.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ROBERT JOHN SIMPSON may practise medicine independently in physical medicine and rehabilitation.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Aberdeen School of Medicine, Medical Sciences and Nutrition, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 12 Dec 2024
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 18 Sep 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 12 Dec 2024

DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 18 Sep 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2019