THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:35:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Cardiology
555 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Cardiology
555 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PIERRE-OLIVIER VEILLETTE shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. VEILLETTE is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. VEILLETTE shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. VEILLETTE is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. VEILLETTE shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. VEILLETTE is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. VEILLETTE no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PIERRE-OLIVIER VEILLETTE shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. VEILLETTE is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. VEILLETTE shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. VEILLETTE is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. VEILLETTE shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. VEILLETTE is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. VEILLETTE no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 2018
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Cardiology
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Cardiology
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Cardiology
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Cardiology
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Toronto
EL - Pediatric Cardiology
21 Oct 2019 to 17 Nov 2019
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Cardiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Cardiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Cardiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Cardiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Pediatric Cardiology
DATE: 21 Oct 2019 to 17 Nov 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Nov 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2019
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2019