THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:37:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Virginia Commonwealth University School of Medicine, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Pediatrics
555 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Phone: 905-472-7534
Fax: 905-472-7535

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Virginia Commonwealth University School of Medicine, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Pediatrics
555 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Phone: 905-472-7534
Fax: 905-472-7535

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LOUISE ING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ING is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LOUISE ING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ING is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Virginia Commonwealth University School of Medicine, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Oct 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Dec 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Oct 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 2019