THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 05:02:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Cambridge School of Clinical Medicine, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600 University Avenue
Mount Sinai Hospital
Heart Function Clinic, Division of Cardiology
Suite 18-358A
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-586-4800
Extension: 4587
Fax: 416-586-5298

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 16 Sep 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 16 Sep 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 16 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 16 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Cambridge School of Clinical Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600 University Avenue
Mount Sinai Hospital
Heart Function Clinic, Division of Cardiology
Suite 18-358A
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-586-4800
Extension: 4587
Fax: 416-586-5298

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 16 Sep 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 16 Sep 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 16 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 16 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
16 Sep 2024
31 May 2031
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 16 2024
EXPIRY DATE: May 31 2031
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. DARSHAN HARSHAD BRAHMBHATT may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Cardiology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. BRAHMBHATT holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. BRAHMBHATT no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. BRAHMBHATT’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. BRAHMBHATT’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 16 September, 2024. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 31 May, 2031.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. DARSHAN HARSHAD BRAHMBHATT may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Cardiology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. BRAHMBHATT holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. BRAHMBHATT no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. BRAHMBHATT’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. BRAHMBHATT’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 16 September, 2024. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 31 May, 2031.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Cambridge School of Clinical Medicine, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Sep 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 31 May 2031

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Dec 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2019