THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:14:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2016
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
EL - Hematology
06 May 2020 to 01 Jun 2020
University of Ottawa
EL - Critical Care Medicine
23 Oct 2019 to 19 Nov 2019
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
SPECIALTY: EL - Hematology
DATE: 06 May 2020 to 01 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: EL - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 23 Oct 2019 to 19 Nov 2019
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Nov 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2019
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Nov 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Oct 2019