THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:53:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: RCSI - Medical University of Bahrain, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department Of Medicine
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Bahrain

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: RCSI - Medical University of Bahrain, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department Of Medicine
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Bahrain

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMED ABDULLA GHULOOM ABDULLA BUCHEERI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. BUCHEERI is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. BUCHEERI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BUCHEERI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. BUCHEERI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. BUCHEERI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. BUCHEERI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMED ABDULLA GHULOOM ABDULLA BUCHEERI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. BUCHEERI is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. BUCHEERI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BUCHEERI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. BUCHEERI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. BUCHEERI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. BUCHEERI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: RCSI - Medical University of Bahrain, 2016
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
16 Feb 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
19 Jan 2023 to 15 Feb 2023
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2022 to 18 Jan 2023
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
19 Jan 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2021 to 18 Jan 2022
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
19 Jan 2021 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2020 to 18 Jan 2021
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
21 Dec 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
University of Toronto
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine
21 Oct 2019 to 20 Dec 2019
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 16 Feb 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 19 Jan 2023 to 15 Feb 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 18 Jan 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 19 Jan 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 18 Jan 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 19 Jan 2021 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 18 Jan 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 21 Dec 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - R - Internal Medicine
DATE: 21 Oct 2019 to 20 Dec 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2019
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Dec 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2019