THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:16:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Nigeria, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, IBO

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3-795 Ottawa St S
Northfield at Strasburg Crossing Family Practice
B3
Kitchener ON N2E 0A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-744-2592
Fax: 519-744-1197
Address: Strasburg Crossing Family Practice
7B - 795 Ottawa St S
Kitchener ON N2E 0A5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Dec 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, IBO
Medical School: University of Nigeria, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3-795 Ottawa St S
Northfield at Strasburg Crossing Family Practice
B3
Kitchener ON N2E 0A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-744-2592
Fax: 519-744-1197
Address: Strasburg Crossing Family Practice
7B - 795 Ottawa St S
Kitchener ON N2E 0A5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Dec 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHIKE UCHENNA NWAMADU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NWAMADU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHIKE UCHENNA NWAMADU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NWAMADU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Nigeria, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 21 Apr 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Feb 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 21 Apr 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Oct 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Oct 2019