THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 04:01:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dr. OK Medical Clinic
1278 The Queensway
Etobicoke Ontario M8Z 1S3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-848 9795
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100-199 County Court Blvd
Brampton ON L6W 4P3
Phone: 9057964680
Extension: 2120
Fax: 6474805049

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kirollos Mikail Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Nov 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dr. OK Medical Clinic
1278 The Queensway
Etobicoke Ontario M8Z 1S3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-848 9795
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100-199 County Court Blvd
Brampton ON L6W 4P3
Phone: 9057964680
Extension: 2120
Fax: 6474805049

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kirollos Mikail Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Nov 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIROLLOS THARWAT YOUSSEF MIKAIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIKAIL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIROLLOS THARWAT YOUSSEF MIKAIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIKAIL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2019
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2019