THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:12:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 430 The Boardwalk
#304
Waterloo Ontario N2T 0C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 578-3500
Extension: 1
Fax: (519) 741-0286
Address: 835 King Street West
Waterloo Regional Health Network
Kitchener Ontario N2G 4K9
Phone: (519) 749-4300
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 430 The Boardwalk
#304
Waterloo Ontario N2T 0C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 578-3500
Extension: 1
Fax: (519) 741-0286
Address: 835 King Street West
Waterloo Regional Health Network
Kitchener Ontario N2G 4K9
Phone: (519) 749-4300
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REBEKAH MICHELLE BAUMANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAUMANN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REBEKAH MICHELLE BAUMANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAUMANN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Sep 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 09 Feb 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Dec 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Aug 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 09 Feb 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jan 2020