THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:58:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Cornell University, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Laboratory Medicine Program
University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth St 11E-421
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-3003
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 01 Nov 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Cornell University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Laboratory Medicine Program
University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth St 11E-421
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-3003
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 01 Nov 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
19 Feb 2021
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 19 2021
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MICHAEL AARON SEIDMAN may practise medicine independently in anatomical pathology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MICHAEL AARON SEIDMAN may practise medicine independently in anatomical pathology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Cornell University, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 19 Feb 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 19 Feb 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2019