THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 04:31:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ahfad University for Women, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ahfad University for Women, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ahfad University for Women, 1999
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Adult Hepatology
01 Jul 2024 to 17 Sep 2024
Western University
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
Western University
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology
01 Oct 2020 to 30 Nov 2020
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Sep 2020
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology
03 Feb 2020 to 30 Jun 2020
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Gastroenterology
11 Nov 2019 to 02 Feb 2020
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Adult Hepatology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 17 Sep 2024
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology
DATE: 01 Oct 2020 to 30 Nov 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Sep 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology
DATE: 03 Feb 2020 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Gastroenterology
DATE: 11 Nov 2019 to 02 Feb 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Sep 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Nov 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2019
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Sep 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Feb 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Nov 2019