THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:26:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of Semmelweis, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2 St Lawrence Dr
Cornwall ON K6H 4Z1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6139336080
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1900 Montreal Rd
Cornwall ON K6H 7L1
Phone: 6139333384
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 201 Eleventh St E
Cornwall ON K6H 2Y6
Phone: 6139337420
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 31 Mar 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 31 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St. Joseph's Continuing Care Centre Greater Sudbury
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
HOSPITAL: St. Joseph's Continuing Care Centre
LOCATION: Greater Sudbury

HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Medical University of Semmelweis, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2 St Lawrence Dr
Cornwall ON K6H 4Z1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6139336080
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1900 Montreal Rd
Cornwall ON K6H 7L1
Phone: 6139333384
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 201 Eleventh St E
Cornwall ON K6H 2Y6
Phone: 6139337420
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 31 Mar 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 31 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St. Joseph's Continuing Care Centre Greater Sudbury
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
HOSPITAL: St. Joseph's Continuing Care Centre
LOCATION: Greater Sudbury

HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HARPREET PANESAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PANESAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HARPREET PANESAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PANESAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of Semmelweis, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Apr 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 2019
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Apr 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Apr 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Nov 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Nov 2019