THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 05:10:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 Charlton Ave E
St Joseph's Healthcare Center
Division of Respirology
Firestone Respiratory Health, Floor 2
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055221155
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 Charlton Ave E
St Joseph's Healthcare Center
Division of Respirology
Firestone Respiratory Health, Floor 2
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055221155
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANHITA SHRIVASTAVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHRIVASTAVA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANHITA SHRIVASTAVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHRIVASTAVA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 09 Feb 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2020
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 May 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 09 Feb 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 2020