THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 05:01:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Michigan State University (Osteopathic), 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
1995 Lens Ave
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (226) 280-6753
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Dec 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Michigan State University (Osteopathic), 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
1995 Lens Ave
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (226) 280-6753
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Dec 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
09 Sep 2021
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 09 2021
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. DAVID NICHOLAS CERVI may practise medicine independently in pediatrics.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. DAVID NICHOLAS CERVI may practise medicine independently in pediatrics.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Michigan State University (Osteopathic), 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 09 Sep 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 Apr 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 09 Sep 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 Apr 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2019