THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:40:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Faculdade Medicina de Santo Amaro, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Brazil

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Faculdade Medicina de Santo Amaro, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Brazil

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
13 Aug 2024
30 Jun 2025
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 13 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2025
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Practice Within the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(1) Dr. BRUNO MANETTI PREVIERO shall practise medicine as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. MANETTI PREVIERO is enrolled at the University of Toronto.

(2) In Dr. MANETTI PREVIERO’s practice in the postgraduate medical education program, Dr. MANETTI PREVIERO shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MANETTI PREVIERO is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education.

(3) In Dr. MANETTI PREVIERO’s practice in the postgraduate medical education program, Dr. MANETTI PREVIERO shall not charge a fee for medical services.

Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(4) Dr. MANETTI PREVIERO may practise medicine in the burn intensive care unit and to the extent of his employment at Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

(5) In Dr. MANETTI PREVIERO’s practice specified in paragraph (4), Dr. MANETTI PREVIERO may not charge a fee for medical services.

Expiry of Certificate

(6) This certificate of registration expires, and Dr. MANETTI PREVIERO must thereupon cease all practice both in and outside the postgraduate medical education program, on the earlier of the following times:

(a) when Dr. MANETTI PREVIERO is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education program provided by a medical school in Ontario, or

(b) when Dr. MANETTI PREVIERO no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Termination of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(7) This certificate automatically converts to a regular Postgraduate Education certificate and Dr. MANETTI PREVIERO must immediately cease all practice outside the postgraduate medical education program if any one of the following occurs:

(a) the supervisor identified in paragraph (4) notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. MANETTI PREVIERO’s practice, including but not limited to concerns regarding knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude;

(b) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. MANETTI PREVIERO’s practice;

(c) the Postgraduate Dean informs the College that the medical school’s approval for Dr. MANETTI PREVIERO to engage in practice outside the postgraduate medical education program has been withdrawn;

(d) when Dr. MANETTI PREVIERO’s employment as specified in paragraph (4) ceases; or

(e) if Dr. MANETTI PREVIERO takes a leave of absence, or transfers to another program, from the postgraduate education program specified in paragraph (1).

Resumption of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(8) In the event of conversion to a regular Postgraduate Education certificate under paragraph (7) or expiry of the certificate under paragraph (7), Dr. MANETTI PREVIERO may not resume any practice outside the postgraduate medical education program under the restricted registration for residents policy until Dr. MANETTI PREVIERO applies for a new certificate of registration and obtains approval by the Registration Committee.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Practice Within the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(1) Dr. BRUNO MANETTI PREVIERO shall practise medicine as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. MANETTI PREVIERO is enrolled at the University of Toronto.

(2) In Dr. MANETTI PREVIERO’s practice in the postgraduate medical education program, Dr. MANETTI PREVIERO shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MANETTI PREVIERO is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education.

(3) In Dr. MANETTI PREVIERO’s practice in the postgraduate medical education program, Dr. MANETTI PREVIERO shall not charge a fee for medical services.

Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(4) Dr. MANETTI PREVIERO may practise medicine in the burn intensive care unit and to the extent of his employment at Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

(5) In Dr. MANETTI PREVIERO’s practice specified in paragraph (4), Dr. MANETTI PREVIERO may not charge a fee for medical services.

Expiry of Certificate

(6) This certificate of registration expires, and Dr. MANETTI PREVIERO must thereupon cease all practice both in and outside the postgraduate medical education program, on the earlier of the following times:

(a) when Dr. MANETTI PREVIERO is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education program provided by a medical school in Ontario, or

(b) when Dr. MANETTI PREVIERO no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Termination of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(7) This certificate automatically converts to a regular Postgraduate Education certificate and Dr. MANETTI PREVIERO must immediately cease all practice outside the postgraduate medical education program if any one of the following occurs:

(a) the supervisor identified in paragraph (4) notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. MANETTI PREVIERO’s practice, including but not limited to concerns regarding knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude;

(b) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. MANETTI PREVIERO’s practice;

(c) the Postgraduate Dean informs the College that the medical school’s approval for Dr. MANETTI PREVIERO to engage in practice outside the postgraduate medical education program has been withdrawn;

(d) when Dr. MANETTI PREVIERO’s employment as specified in paragraph (4) ceases; or

(e) if Dr. MANETTI PREVIERO takes a leave of absence, or transfers to another program, from the postgraduate education program specified in paragraph (1).

Resumption of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(8) In the event of conversion to a regular Postgraduate Education certificate under paragraph (7) or expiry of the certificate under paragraph (7), Dr. MANETTI PREVIERO may not resume any practice outside the postgraduate medical education program under the restricted registration for residents policy until Dr. MANETTI PREVIERO applies for a new certificate of registration and obtains approval by the Registration Committee.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Faculdade Medicina de Santo Amaro, 2009
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine
23 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
AVP - Emergency Medicine
01 Jul 2023 to 22 Sep 2023
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
11 Dec 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
01 Jul 2021 to 10 Dec 2021
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
20 Feb 2020 to 30 Jun 2020
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Critical Care Medicine
10 Dec 2019 to 19 Feb 2020
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine
DATE: 23 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: AVP - Emergency Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 22 Sep 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 11 Dec 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 10 Dec 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 20 Feb 2020 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 10 Dec 2019 to 19 Feb 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Feb 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Aug 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 13 Aug 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Feb 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Dec 2019