THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:08:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: Atef Kamel Khalil Ahmed, Randa (Used Until: 12 Feb 2024)
Medical School: Katholieke Universiteit Leuven, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC, DUTCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-4501
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: Atef Kamel Khalil Ahmed, Randa (Used Until: 12 Feb 2024)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC, DUTCH
Medical School: Katholieke Universiteit Leuven, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-4501
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RANDA KAMEL may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. KAMEL is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. KAMEL shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. KAMEL is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. KAMEL shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. KAMEL ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. KAMEL ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RANDA KAMEL may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. KAMEL is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. KAMEL shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. KAMEL is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. KAMEL shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. KAMEL ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. KAMEL ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Katholieke Universiteit Leuven, 2013
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology
12 Aug 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Radiation Oncology
01 Jul 2024 to 11 Aug 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology
01 Jan 2021 to 31 Mar 2021
University of Ottawa
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology
01 Jan 2021 to 31 Mar 2021
University of Ottawa
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology
01 Jul 2020 to 31 Dec 2020
University of Ottawa
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology
25 Mar 2020 to 30 Jun 2020
University of Ottawa
PEAP - CF - Radiation Oncology
01 Jan 2020 to 24 Mar 2020
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology
DATE: 12 Aug 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Radiation Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 11 Aug 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology
DATE: 01 Jan 2021 to 31 Mar 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology
DATE: 01 Jan 2021 to 31 Mar 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 31 Dec 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology
DATE: 25 Mar 2020 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Radiation Oncology
DATE: 01 Jan 2020 to 24 Mar 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Mar 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2020
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Mar 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Mar 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2020