THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
27/05/25 19:58:11 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Khalid University College of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King Khalid University College of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Khalid University College of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2011
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
01 Jul 2022 to 31 Dec 2022
Western University
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
02 Dec 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
01 Jul 2021 to 01 Dec 2021
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
19 Feb 2020 to 30 Jun 2020
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PEAP - CF - Cardiology
02 Dec 2019 to 18 Feb 2020
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 31 Dec 2022
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
DATE: 02 Dec 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 01 Dec 2021
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
DATE: 19 Feb 2020 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Cardiology
DATE: 02 Dec 2019 to 18 Feb 2020
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2019
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Feb 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Dec 2019