THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 05:07:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5B - 883 Mulock Dr
North GTA Health Centre
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 8S3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 235-3825
Fax: 905-235-3942
Address: 1-7475 McCowan Rd
Markham ON L3S 3J6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Oct 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 13 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5B - 883 Mulock Dr
North GTA Health Centre
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 8S3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 235-3825
Fax: 905-235-3942
Address: 1-7475 McCowan Rd
Markham ON L3S 3J6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Oct 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 13 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
13 Oct 2022
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Oct 13 2022
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. BRAMMIYA NAGULESAPILLAI may practise medicine independently in family medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. BRAMMIYA NAGULESAPILLAI may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 13 Oct 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 06 May 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 13 Oct 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 06 May 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Dec 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Dec 2019