THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:08:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Apr 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 21 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR BAESHU MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 May 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Apr 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 21 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR BAESHU MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 May 2023

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2020
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Aug 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jan 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 07 Jan 2020