THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 03:43:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3364 Lake Shore Boulevard West
Toronto Ontario M8W 1M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-352-5533
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 690 Sidney Street
Belleville Ontario K8P 4A8
Phone: 613-967-9595
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 60 Carlton Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1J2
Phone: 4166461890
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 701 10th St SE
Cedar Rapids IA United States 52403-1292
Phone: 319-398-6011
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Aug 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 09 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Iowa

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3364 Lake Shore Boulevard West
Toronto Ontario M8W 1M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-352-5533
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 690 Sidney Street
Belleville Ontario K8P 4A8
Phone: 613-967-9595
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 60 Carlton Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1J2
Phone: 4166461890
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 701 10th St SE
Cedar Rapids IA United States 52403-1292
Phone: 319-398-6011
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Aug 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 09 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Iowa

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMAN LUTHRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUTHRA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMAN LUTHRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUTHRA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 08 Mar 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 08 Mar 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Feb 2020