THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/05/25 05:17:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 7007 14 St SW
Rockyview General Hospital
Emergency Medicine Department
Rockyview General Hospital
Calgary AB T2V 1P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 403-943-3000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 08 Nov 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority Moose Factory
HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
LOCATION: Moose Factory

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 7007 14 St SW
Rockyview General Hospital
Emergency Medicine Department
Rockyview General Hospital
Calgary AB T2V 1P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 403-943-3000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 08 Nov 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority Moose Factory
HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
LOCATION: Moose Factory

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMMELINE RUKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUKA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMMELINE RUKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUKA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2020
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jan 2020