THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:39:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2015
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
30 Nov 2020 to 11 Dec 2020
McMaster University
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
16 Nov 2020 to 29 Nov 2020
University of Toronto
EL - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
09 Mar 2020 to 03 Apr 2020
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 30 Nov 2020 to 11 Dec 2020
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 16 Nov 2020 to 29 Nov 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
DATE: 09 Mar 2020 to 03 Apr 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 03 Apr 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2020
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 03 Apr 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 2020